TN HB2684 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a defendant for whom a bench warrant is issued due to failure to appear on a felony or a Class A or Class B misdemeanor that is violent or sexual in nature as determined by the court, or who is charged with a failure to appear, to be placed on any available state or federal list or database as a fugitive from justice, without limitation, within 10 days after the bench warrant is received by law enforcement. - Amends TCA Section 40-11-139 and Section 40-11-142.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 40-11-139 and Section 40-11-142, relative to release of defendants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/9/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2304 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-29 - Enrolled and ready for signatures