TN HB2629 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Children and Family Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Children and Family Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, alters the definition of dependent and neglected child to include a child whose parent willfully fails to ensure that the child is enrolled in and attending school rather than a child who is unlawfully kept out of school. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, alters the definition of dependent and neglected child to include a child whose parent willfully fails to ensure that the child is enrolled in and attending school rather than a child who is unlawfully kept out of school. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal Family Justice of C&FA for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | Assigned to s/c Family Justice of C&FA | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2586 (Crossfiled) 2010-02-02 - Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/16/2010
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2629&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2629.pdf |