TN HB2504 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes an offense for a person, on behalf of a debt collector or inbound telemarketer service, to knowingly cause a caller identification service to transmit misleading or inaccurate caller identification information to a subscriber with the intent to defraud or cause harm to another person or to wrongfully obtain anything of value, rather than with the intent to induce the subscriber to answer. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 47, Chapter 18.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 47, Chapter 18, relative to caller identification spoofing.
Sponsors
Rep. Torrey Harris [D] | Rep. Jesse Chism [D] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. Sam McKenzie [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2024 | |
2024-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 758 | |
2024-04-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-04-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-03 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-03-26 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-25 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-03-25 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0623) |
2024-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Action def. in Commerce Committee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee to 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/13/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Sponsor change. |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2410 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 758