TN HB2454 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Anti-Road Rage Act of 2024"; creates a Class E felony for the reckless discharge of a firearm while operating, or as a passenger in, a motor vehicle; creates a Class A misdemeanor for the reckless brandishing or display of a firearm while operating, or as a passenger in, a motor vehicle. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 55.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 55, relative to road rage.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2160 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-02 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee