TN HB2285 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Constitutional Counsel Commission Act" to create a 13-member commission and a nine-member advisory board. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 8, Chapter 14 and Title 16.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Constitutional Counsel Commission Act" to create a 13-member commission and a nine-member advisory board. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 8, Chapter 14 and Title 16.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Love [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2340 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee