TN HB2080 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits an individual holding an elected office of a local government from holding another elected office in this state at the same time; expands the prohibition on a candidate qualifying or being nominated for more than one state office or county constitutional office to include any elected office in this state. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 8.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2 and Title 8, relative to public office.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Wright [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-09 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/9/2024 |
2024-04-02 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 4/9/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/14/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1968 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Held on desk.