TN HB2002 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 971
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 971
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes the requirement that an automobile retail seller must insure its GAP waiver obligation when the automobile retail seller does not assign the financing agreement of which a GAP waiver is a part to anyone other than the retail seller's related finance company. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 59.
Title
As enacted, removes the requirement that an automobile retail seller must insure its GAP waiver obligation when the automobile retail seller does not assign the financing agreement of which a GAP waiver is a part to anyone other than the retail seller's related finance company. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 59.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Business and Utilities Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Business and Utilities Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 971 |
2014-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-14 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed Behind the Budget |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-03-19 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-11 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2014-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2014-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2024 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 971