TN HB1951 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Rcvd. from H., P1C.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Rcvd. from H., P1C.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that plans are not required to be submitted prior to approval when real property contracts are awarded after the commission approves the utilization of an alternative delivery method. - Amends TCA Section 4-15-102.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that plans are not required to be submitted prior to approval when real property contracts are awarded after the commission approves the utilization of an alternative delivery method. - Amends TCA Section 4-15-102.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2014-03-20 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-03-20 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 2 |
2014-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/20/2014 |
2014-03-17 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2014-03-13 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/17/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/13/2014 |
2014-03-06 | House | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 3/13/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/6/2014 |
2014-02-25 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/19/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2014-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2014-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1653 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-22 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.