TN HB1931 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 910
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 910
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions governing the baccalaureate education system trust fund program; requires department of revenue to assist board of trustees of the program in the implementation of certain tax incentives. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 8; Title 55, Chapter 4; Title 67, Chapter 2 and Title 67, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions governing the baccalaureate education system trust fund program; requires department of revenue to assist board of trustees of the program in the implementation of certain tax incentives. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 8; Title 55, Chapter 4; Title 67, Chapter 2 and Title 67, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 910 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Effective date(s) 05/13/2014 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | H. concurred in S. am. no. 2, Ayes 91, Nays 0 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | H. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | S. adopted am. #2 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Tabling motion lifted |
2014-04-09 | Senate | H. returned to S. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | H. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | S. Recalled from H. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | H. Recalled from Governor |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. |
2014-03-20 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2014-03-17 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-03-17 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0 |
2014-03-17 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0774) |
2014-03-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/17/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/13/2014 |
2014-03-04 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 2/11/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2014-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2014-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2106 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 910