TN HB1894 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, defines food that contains a vaccine or vaccine material as a drug for purposes of the Tennessee Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 53.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 53, relative to foods that contain certain substances.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Bryan Richey [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] |
Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. Elaine Davis [R] | Rep. Greg Martin [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Effective date(s) 04/22/2024 | |
2024-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 742 | |
2024-04-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-04-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-02 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 24, Nays 6 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-03-05 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-03-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-04 | House | Passed H., Ayes 73, Nays 22, PNV 1 |
2024-02-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/4/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/29/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/21/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Health Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 2/14/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/6/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee - Health Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1903 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 742