TN HB1821 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a person to obtain an enhanced handgun permit or a concealed handgun carry permit to carry a handgun in certain counties; requires the department of safety to create a three-year pilot program in certain counties that waives the application and processing fee for an enhanced handgun carry permit and a concealed handgun carry permit for applicants residing in those counties. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13, relative to firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/13/2024 |
2024-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1830 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-01 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee