TN HB1680 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Effective date(s) 02/28/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Effective date(s) 02/28/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the Tennessee Adult Protection Act's definition of abuse or neglect to include certain situations when an adult is unable to maintain the adult's own health or welfare. - Amends TCA Section 71-6-102.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 71-6-102, relative to abuse or neglect of adults.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Effective date(s) 02/28/2024 | |
2024-03-19 | Pub. Ch. 512 | |
2024-02-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-02-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-02-23 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-15 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-15 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-02-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/15/2024 |
2024-02-12 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2024-02-08 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/12/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/8/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/6/2024 |
2024-01-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-30 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 1/30/2024 |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2076 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 512