TN HB1456 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 904
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 904
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates separate offenses for the manufacture, delivery, sale, or possession with intent to manufacture, deliver or sell methamphetamine and for possession or causal exchange of methamphetamine. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, creates separate offenses for the manufacture, delivery, sale, or possession with intent to manufacture, deliver or sell methamphetamine and for possession or causal exchange of methamphetamine. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Health Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Health Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 904 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Effective date(s) 07/01/2014 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1, Ayes 94, Nays 0 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | S. adopted am. #1 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. |
2014-03-27 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2014-03-25 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-03-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0 |
2014-03-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/20/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Health Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/12/2014 |
2014-03-04 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/25/2014 |
2014-01-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2014-01-16 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee--Health |
2014-01-15 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-14 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1596 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 904