TN HB1433 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 764
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 764
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows imposition of penalties if electronic funds transfers are dishonored; allocates to the general fund proceeds from a certain state privilege tax; authorizes disclosure of tax information to local governments that is otherwise confidential, under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As enacted, allows imposition of penalties if electronic funds transfers are dishonored; allocates to the general fund proceeds from a certain state privilege tax; authorizes disclosure of tax information to local governments that is otherwise confidential, under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 764 |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Effective date(s) 04/24/2014 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. |
2014-03-27 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2014-03-25 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-03-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0 |
2014-03-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/20/2014 |
2014-03-04 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/26/2014 |
2014-01-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-01-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-13 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1637 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 764