TN HB1407 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits a person with a handgun carry permit to carry a firearm in any state, county or municipal park or other recreation area; deletes provisions allowing local governments to prohibit carrying in parks by resolution or ordinance. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As introduced, permits a person with a handgun carry permit to carry a firearm in any state, county or municipal park or other recreation area; deletes provisions allowing local governments to prohibit carrying in parks by resolution or ordinance. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Civil Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Civil Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed Behind the Budget |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-03-12 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/12/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/5/2014 |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2014-01-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2014-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-13 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1496 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-20 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.