TN HB1268 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 363
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, encourages the commission to prescribe high performance building requirements and other standards, and promulgate rules, which meet or exceed the 2005 Sustainable Design Guidelines that the commission implemented, that are necessary to ensure all state buildings perform in an energy efficient manner; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 11; Title 12; Title 13; Title 43 and Title 49, Chapter 17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, encourages the commission to prescribe high performance building requirements and other standards, and promulgate rules, which meet or exceed the 2005 Sustainable Design Guidelines that the commission implemented, that are necessary to ensure all state buildings perform in an energy efficient manner; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 11; Title 12; Title 13; Title 43 and Title 49, Chapter 17.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-18 - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-26 - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-19 - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Government Operations Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-22SenatePub. Ch. 363
2013-05-22SenateEffective date(s) 05/13/2013
2013-05-13SenateSigned by Governor.
2013-05-01SenateTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2013-05-01SenateSigned by S. Speaker
2013-05-01SenateSigned by H. Speaker
2013-04-23SenateEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2013-04-18SenateH. concurred in S. am. no. 1
2013-04-17SenateH. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/18/2013
2013-04-17SenatePassed S. as am., Ayes 29, Nays 0
2013-04-17SenateS. adopted am. 1
2013-04-17SenateS. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
2013-04-03HouseRcvd. from H., P1C.
2013-04-01HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2013-04-01HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0
2013-04-01HouseH. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0162)
2013-03-28HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2013
2013-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2013
2013-03-26HouseRec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
2013-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/26/2013
2013-03-19HouseRec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Government Operations Committee
2013-03-13HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/19/2013
2013-03-13HouseRec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2013-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/13/2013
2013-02-26HouseAssigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
2013-02-25HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2013-02-21HouseP1C.
2013-02-14HouseIntro.
2013-02-14HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1307 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 363

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback