TN HB1129 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 939
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 939
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes requirements for curriculum regarding certain American documents; revises provisions regarding curriculum for educating students about government; revises other related provisions; requires report by state board of education. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, establishes requirements for curriculum regarding certain American documents; revises provisions regarding curriculum for educating students about government; revises other related provisions; requires report by state board of education. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-11 - House - EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 939 |
2014-03-13 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-03-06 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/13/2014 |
2014-03-06 | House | Reset on Regular cal. for 3/13/14 |
2014-02-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/6/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/27/2014 |
2014-02-11 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/11/2014 |
2014-01-28 | House | Action Def. in Education Committee to 2/11/2014 |
2014-01-22 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 1/28/2014 |
2014-01-21 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2014-01-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 1/21/2014 |
2013-03-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to the Department of Education |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2013-02-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-13 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1266 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 939