TN HB0961 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, states that a law enforcement officer meeting certain qualifications who makes an arrest outside of the law enforcement officer's jurisdiction has the same legal status and immunity from suit as a state or local law enforcement officer making an arrest within the state or local law enforcement officer's jurisdiction if certain circumstances are met. - Amends TCA Section 38-3-113.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 38-3-113, relative to immunity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/04/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 336 | |
2021-05-04 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-04-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-22 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 5 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-08 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1232 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 336