TN HB0961 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 214
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 214
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the state board of education to post the teacher code of ethics on its Web site. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 10.
Title
As enacted, requires the state board of education to post the teacher code of ethics on its Web site. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 10.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Coley [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 214 | |
2011-05-04 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2011-04-28 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-28 | Reset on Next Available Regular cal. | |
2011-04-27 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Reset on Next Available Regular cal. | |
2011-04-21 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/21/2011 | |
2011-04-19 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-03-31 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2011-03-30 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/30/2011 | |
2011-03-03 | Re-ref. to Government Operations Committee | |
2011-03-01 | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means | |
2011-02-23 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/1/2011 | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee--Government Operations for review | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0854 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-25 - Pub. Ch. 214