TN HB0835 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the coordinator of elections to compare the statewide voter registration database with those of other relevant state agencies and county records when compiling information to distribute to the county elections commissions for purposes of purging voters who have moved; requires the coordinator of elections to compare the statewide voter registration database with the department of safety database to ensure non-United States citizens are not registered to vote in this state. - Amends TCA Section 2-2-106 and Section 2-2-141.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 2-2-106 and Section 2-2-141, relative to election integrity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - HOUSE ELECTIONS & CAMPAIGN FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - HOUSE ELECTIONS & CAMPAIGN FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-16 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 3 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA1001) |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0341) |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-04-04 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-04 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 75, Nays 22, PNV 0 |
2024-04-04 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0815) |
2024-04-04 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0409) |
2024-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/12/2024 |
2023-04-19 | House | Re-ref. to Local Government Committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/11/2023 |
2023-04-04 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 4/11/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0137 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-16 - Sponsor(s) Added.