SD SB3 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Signed by Governor S.J. 673
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Signed by Governor S.J. 673
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for continuity in the judicial review of certain lawsuits, complaints, and petitions between parties to a petition for certain protection orders.
Title
Provide for continuity in the judicial review of certain lawsuits, complaints, and petitions between parties to a petition for certain protection orders.
Sponsors
Sen. Deb Soholt [R] | Sen. Deb Peters [R] | Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] | Rep. Mike Stevens [R] |
Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Rep. Kristin Conzet [R] | Rep. Peggy Gibson [D] | Rep. Tona Rozum [R] |
Rep. Karen Soli [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 673 |
2014-03-13 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 652 |
2014-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 750 |
2014-03-11 | House | Signed by President S.J. 629 |
2014-03-10 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 588 |
2014-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 654 |
2014-03-03 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 600 |
2014-03-03 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 3jc |
2014-03-03 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2014-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-26 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2014-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-11 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 374 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 272 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 177 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 125 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 3ja |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-14 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 13 |