SD SB27 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020 S.J. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020 S.J. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a missing persons clearinghouse.
Title
Establish a missing persons clearinghouse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020 S.J. 557 |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 522 |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583 |
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 475 |
2020-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 505 |
2020-03-04 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-03-04 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 77 |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading House H.J. 64 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 77 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 67 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 60 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 57 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 27A |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 11 |