SD SB27 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2016 S.J. 466
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2016 S.J. 466
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain personnel requirements for ambulance services and to repeal the hardship exemption.
Title
Revise certain personnel requirements for ambulance services and to repeal the hardship exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2016 S.J. 466 |
2016-02-22 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 22, 2016 S.J. 378 |
2016-02-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 470 |
2016-02-18 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 349 |
2016-02-17 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 423 |
2016-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 405 |
2016-02-11 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 385 |
2016-02-10 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 373 |
2016-02-09 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 350 |
2016-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 330 |
2016-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 306 |
2016-02-04 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 274 |
2016-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-27 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 200 |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 143 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 126 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 19 |