SD SB185 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 20, NAYS 15. S.J. 451
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 20, NAYS 15. S.J. 451
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to support the W.H. Over Museum and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to support the W.H. Over Museum and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 20, NAYS 15. S.J. 451 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Intent to reconsider S.J. 436 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 21, NAYS 13. S.J. 435 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 377 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 185ma |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 202 |