SD HB1217 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 5, NAYS 28. S.J. 470
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 5, NAYS 28. S.J. 470
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal a provision that prohibits hunting of mourning doves on certain property.
Title
Repeal a provision that prohibits hunting of mourning doves on certain property.
Sponsors
Rep. Spencer Gosch [R] | Rep. Dan Kaiser [R] | Sen. Kyle Schoenfish [R] | Rep. Gary Cammack [R] |
Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] | Sen. Jordan Youngberg [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 5, NAYS 28. S.J. 470 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. S.J. 444 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 367 |
2018-02-02 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 317 |
2018-02-01 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-01 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 273 |
2018-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 202 |