SD HB1212 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-03-14 - Signed by Governor H.J. 780
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for fair and open competition in certain governmental contracts, to prohibit the inclusion of certain terms in governmental contracts and documents, and to establish a procedure to grant certain exemptions after notice and a public hearing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for fair and open competition in certain governmental contracts, to prohibit the inclusion of certain terms in governmental contracts and documents, and to establish a procedure to grant certain exemptions after notice and a public hearing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate Do Pass (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-14SenateSigned by Governor H.J. 780
2014-03-10SenateDelivered to the Governor H.J. 694
2014-03-06SenateSigned by President S.J. 575
2014-03-05SenateSigned by Speaker H.J. 660
2014-03-04SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 5. S.J. 538
2014-03-03SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. S.J. 511
2014-03-03SenateScheduled for hearing
2014-02-18SenateReferred to Senate State Affairs, Passed S.J. 344
2014-02-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 312
2014-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 17. H.J. 382
2014-02-10HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 347
2014-02-10HouseScheduled for hearing
2014-02-04HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 264

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback