SD HB1181 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Signed by Governor H.J. 831
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Signed by Governor H.J. 831
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate the consolidation incentives for any school districts that consolidate after July 1, 2010.
Title
Eliminate the consolidation incentives for any school districts that consolidate after July 1, 2010.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 42 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Education Reconsidered (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Education Tabled (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 42 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Education Reconsidered (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Education Tabled (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Signed by Governor H.J. 831 | |
2010-03-09 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 795 | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by President S.J. 603 | |
2010-03-04 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 711 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 19, NAYS 15. S.J. 554 | |
2010-03-02 | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 504 | |
2010-03-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-24 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 460 | |
2010-02-23 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 42, NAYS 28. H.J. 584 | |
2010-02-22 | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 6. H.J. 500 | |
2010-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-19 | Education Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. | |
2010-02-17 | Education Tabled, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 7. H.J. 444 | |
2010-02-17 | Education Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 7, NAYS 8. | |
2010-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-28 | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 222 |