SD HB1143 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal certain provisions regarding unemployment insurance benefit eligibility of workers attending approved training.
Title
Repeal certain provisions regarding unemployment insurance benefit eligibility of workers attending approved training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 790 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 773 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 653 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 750 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 18. H.J. 718 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 23, NAYS 9. S.J. 600 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 575 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 529 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1143ta |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 292 |
2014-02-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 14. H.J. 359 |
2014-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 341 |
2014-02-05 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 288 |
2014-02-05 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1143sa |
2014-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-29 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 150 |