SC S1329 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-08 - Act No. 305
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-08 - Act No. 305
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reapportion The Seven Single-member Districts From Which The Trustees Are Elected Beginning With The School District Elections In 2014, To Designate A Map Number On Which These Election Districts Are Delineated, To Provide Demographic Information Pertaining To The Reapportioned Election Districts, And To Provide For The Terms And Manner Of Election Of Trustees
Title
Edgefield County School District Board of Trustees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 56 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-08 | Act No. 305 | |
2014-06-13 | Effective date 06/06/14 | |
2014-06-06 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Ratified R 289 | |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2014-06-04 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2014-06-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-63 Nays-0 |
2014-06-03 | House | Read second time |
2014-06-03 | House | Amended |
2014-05-29 | House | Recalled from Edgefield Delegation |
2014-05-29 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-05-29 | House | Referred to Edgefield Delegation |
2014-05-29 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Amended |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |