SC S1163 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name A Portion Of Highway 703 And The Intersection Of Chuck Dawley Boulevard (i-526b) In Charleston County "detective Pat Messer Memorial Highway" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Location Containing The Designation.
Title
Detective William “Pat†Messer Memorial Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2024-04-09 | House | Debate adjourned |
2024-03-28 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2024-03-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2024-03-21 | House | Introduced |
2024-03-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |