SC S1148 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-18)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-18)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Express The Belief Of The General Assembly That Nascar Racing Is An Integral And Vital Part Of The State Of South Carolina And Its Economy And To Recognize The Darlington Raceway As One Of Our State's Most Treasured Attractions, As Well As Identify South Carolina's Rich Nascar History In The State Of South Carolina And To Name The Week Of April 6, 2014 Through April 13, 2014 As Darlington Raceway Week, A Week Too Tough To Tame.
Title
Darlington Raceway Week
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Introduced, adopted, sent to House |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=1148&session=120&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/1148_20140320.htm |