SC S0944 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Enacting The "paid Family Leave Insurance Act" By Adding Chapter 103 To Title 38 So As To Define Terms, Establish Family Leave Benefits, Outline Requirements Of Family Leave Insurance Policies, And Provide Exclusions, Among Other Things.
Title
Paid Family Leave Insurance Act
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Gambrell [R] | Sen. Sean Bennett [R] | Sen. Ross Turner [R] | Sen. Michael Fanning [D] |
Sen. Thomas Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2024-02-27 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-45 Nays-0 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance |
2024-02-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4832 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Committee report: Favorable with amendment Banking and Insurance
H4990 (Similar To) 2024-01-31 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
H4990 (Similar To) 2024-01-31 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry