SC S0866 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A Bill To Provide That Tax Credits For The Purchase Of Geothermal Machinery And Equipment Shall Be Repealed On January 1, 2029.
Title
Act No. 134, Geothermal machinery purchasing
Sponsors
Sen. Ronnie Cromer [R] | Sen. John Scott [D] | Sen. Glenn Reese [D] | Sen. Danny Verdin [R] |
Sen. John Matthews [D] | Sen. Floyd Nicholson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |