SC S0741 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - Act No. 228
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - Act No. 228
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Include Suspension Of Hunting Licenses And Confiscation, Forfeiture, And Sale Of Certain Associated Property, To Provide Each Unlawfully Imported Animal Constitutes A Separate Offense, And To Give Exclusive Jurisdiction To The Magistrates Court
Title
Use of laser sights while hunting coyotes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-26 | Act No. 228 | |
2012-06-20 | Effective date 06/18/12 | |
2012-06-18 | Signed By Governor | |
2012-06-12 | Ratified R 266 | |
2012-06-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2012-06-07 | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 | |
2012-06-07 | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled | |
2012-06-07 | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments | |
2012-06-06 | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 | |
2012-06-06 | Read second time | |
2012-06-06 | Amended | |
2012-06-06 | Debate adjourned | |
2012-06-05 | Debate adjourned until Wed., 06-06-12 | |
2012-05-30 | Recalled from Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-28 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-04-27 | Read third time and sent to House | |
2011-04-27 | Amended | |
2011-04-26 | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 | |
2011-04-26 | Read second time | |
2011-04-26 | Amended | |
2011-04-26 | Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2011-04-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-04-20 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry | |
2011-03-29 | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry | |
2011-03-29 | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 11 | 710 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 11 | 740 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 16 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |