SC S0380 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Act No. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Act No. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 63-7-20, Relating To Children's Code Definitions, So As To Define "legal Guardianship" And "legal Guardian"; By Amending Section 63-7-1700, Relating To Permanency Planning, So As To Provide For Procedures To Establish Legal Guardianship With Supplemental Benefits When Adoption Is Not An Option And By Making Conforming Changes; By Adding Section 63-7-1705 So As To Establish Procedures For Initiating The Judicial Establishment Of Legal Guardianship With Supplemental Benefits; By Adding Article 9 To Chapter 7, Title 63 So As To Require The Department Of Social Services To Establish And Administer A Program Of Supplemental Benefits For Legal Guardianship, To Define Terms, To Provide Eligibility Requirements For Program Benefits, To Require The Department To Promulgate Regulations, And For Other Purposes; By Amending Section 63-1-20, Relating To The State's Children's Policy, So As To Include Legal Guardianship When Adoption Is Not Appropriate; And By Amending Section 63-7-2350, Relating To Restrictions On Foster Care Or Adoption Placements, So As To Apply Also To Placement Of A Child In A Legal Guardian's Home. - Ratified Title
Title
Kinship Guardianship
Sponsors
Sen. Katrina Shealy [R] | Sen. Thomas McElveen [D] | Sen. Bradley Hutto [D] | Sen. Darrell Jackson [D] |
Sen. Penry Gustafson [R] | Sen. Thomas Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | Act No. 25 | |
2023-05-26 | Effective date 05/16/23 | |
2023-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2023-05-11 | Ratified R 32 | |
2023-05-04 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2023-05-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2023-05-03 | House | Read second time |
2023-05-02 | House | Debate adjourned |
2023-04-27 | House | Debate adjourned |
2023-04-26 | House | Debate adjourned |
2023-04-25 | House | Debate adjourned |
2023-04-20 | House | Debate adjourned |
2023-04-19 | House | Debate adjourned |
2023-04-18 | House | Debate adjourned |
2023-04-05 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 4-18-23 |
2023-04-04 | House | Debate adjourned |
2023-03-29 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-16 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-02-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Family and Veterans' Services |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 7 | 1700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 7 | 1705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 7 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 7 | 2350 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |