SC H5314 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Concurred in amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Concurred in amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Intersection Of United States Highway 25 (white Horse Road) And South Carolina Highway 183 (saluda Dam Road) In The Greenville County Town Of Berea "harold M. Batson, Jr. Memorial Intersection" And Erect Appropriate Signs Or Markers At This Location Containing These Words.
Title
Harold M. Batson, Jr. Memorial Intersection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | House | Concurred in amendment |
2024-05-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-04-09 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2024-03-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2024-03-21 | House | Introduced |