SC H4927 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Chapter 12 To Title 44 So As To Create The "executive Office Of Health And Policy", To Provide For The Duties Of The Secretary Of The Office, And To Provide For The Restructuring Of Certain Departments Of State Government To Become Component Departments Of The Office; By Amending Section 1-30-10, Relating To Departments Of State Government, So As To Make Conforming Changes; By Amending Section 8-17-370, Relating To The Mediation Of Grievances By The State Human Resources Director, So As To Add The Secretary Of Health And Policy, The Office's Component Department Directors, And Others To The List Of Exempted Public Employees; By Amending Section 43-21-70, Relating To The Employment Of The Director Of The Department On Aging, So As To Make Conforming Changes, And For Other Purposes; And By Repealing Chapter 9 Of Title 44 Relating To The State Department Of Mental Health.
Title
Executive Office of Health Policy
Sponsors
Rep. William Herbkersman [R] | Rep. Weston Newton [R] | Rep. Murrell Smith [R] | Rep. Carla Schuessler [R] |
Rep. Brandon Newton [R] | Rep. Robert Williams [D] | Rep. Joseph Jefferson [D] | Rep. William Hewitt [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 91 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Table Amendment 5 Amendment Number 5 (Y: 97 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Table Amendment 9 Amendment Number 9 (Y: 89 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Table Amendment 6 Amendment Number 6 (Y: 88 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Table Amendment 3 Amendment Number 3 (Y: 90 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Table Amendment 5 Amendment Number 5 (Y: 97 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Table Amendment 9 Amendment Number 9 (Y: 89 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Table Amendment 6 Amendment Number 6 (Y: 88 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Table Amendment 3 Amendment Number 3 (Y: 90 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-02-29 | House | Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-18 |
2024-02-29 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-17 |
2024-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-28 | House | Amended |
2024-02-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, Hewitt |
2024-02-27 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2024-02-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Newton, Williams |
2024-02-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-02-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-02-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Schuessler |
2024-02-14 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0915 (Similar To) 2024-04-24 - Scrivener's error corrected
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 30 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
43 | 21 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 17 | 370 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |