SC H4673 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 250
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 250
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Specify Certain Methods Of Proof Or Acknowledgment Necessary For Recording Deeds Or Other Written Instruments
Title
Revocation of certain beneficiary designations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 27 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 250 | |
2018-05-30 | Effective date 05/18/18 | |
2018-05-18 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 261 | |
2018-05-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-93 Nays-0 |
2018-05-02 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-1 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Massey (ch), McElveen, Senn |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-01-30 | House | Roll call Yeas-114 Nays-0 |
2018-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-30 | House | Amended |
2018-01-25 | House | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brawley, Weeks |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |