SC H3563 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 19 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-03-19 - Act No. 136
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Define "electronic Mail", To Provide That When Rent Is Seven Or More Calendar Days Past Due The Owner May Deny The Occupant Access To The Personal Property And The Occupant Is Considered In Default, To Provide That When Rent Is Fourteen Or More Days Past Due The Occupant Must Be Notified, To Provide The Option Of Notification Through Electronic Mail, And To Provide The Process By Which A Defaulting Occupant's Personal Property May Be Destroyed Or Sold

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Self-Service Storage Facility Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-05 - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 93 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-19 Act No. 136
2014-03-18 Effective date 03/13/14
2014-03-13 Signed By Governor
2014-03-11 Ratified R 148
2014-03-05HouseRoll call Yeas-97 Nays-3
2014-03-05HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2014-02-27SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2014-02-26SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2014-02-26SenateRead second time
2014-02-25SenateCommittee Amendment Amended and Adopted
2014-02-20 Scrivener's error corrected
2014-02-19SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2014-01-09SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Thurmond (ch), McElveen, Turner
2013-05-28SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2013-05-28SenateIntroduced and read first time
2013-05-24HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2013-05-23HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2013-05-23HouseRoll call Yeas-93 Nays-18
2013-05-23HouseRead second time
2013-05-23HouseAmended
2013-05-15HouseDebate adjourned until Thur., 5-16-13
2013-04-30HouseRequests for debate removed-Rep
2013-04-26 Scrivener's error corrected
2013-04-25HouseRequests for debate removed-Rep
2013-04-16HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2013-04-11 Scrivener's error corrected
2013-04-10HouseCommittee report: Favorable Judiciary
2013-02-28HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Lucas
2013-02-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: J.E.Smith
2013-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2013-02-19HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0513 (Similar To) 2013-04-01 - Referred to Subcommittee: Thurmond (ch), McElveen, Turner
S0513 (Similar To) 2013-04-01 - Referred to Subcommittee: Thurmond (ch), McElveen, Turner

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3563&session=120&summary=B
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/3563_20130219.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/3563_20130410.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/3563_20130411.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/3563_20130426.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/3563_20130523.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/3563_20140219.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/3563_20140220.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/3563_20140225.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=6313
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=7131
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=7274

Bill Comments

feedback