SC H3541 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-9)
Status: Passed on September 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-08 - Act No. 297
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-9)
Status: Passed on September 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-08 - Act No. 297
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
An Amendment To Section 7, Article Vi Of The Constitution Of South Carolina, 1895, Relating To The Constitutional Officers Of This State, To Provide That Upon The Expiration Of The Term Of The Adjutant General Serving In Office On The Date Of The Ratification Of This Provision The Adjutant General Must Be Appointed By The Governor Upon The Advice And Consent Of The Senate For A Term Not Coterminous With The Governor, May Be Removed Only For Cause, And The General Assembly Shall Provide By Law For The Term, Duties, Compensation, And Qualifications For Office, The Procedures By Which The Appointment Is Made, And The Procedures By Which The Adjutant General May Be Removed From Office; And Proposing An Amendment To Section 4, Article Xiii, Relating To The Adjutant General And His Staff Officers, To Update References To His Title And Provide That The Adjutant General's Military Rank Is Major General As Opposed To Brigadier General, And To Provide That Upon The Expiration Of The Term Of The Adjutant General Serving In Office On The Date Of The Ratification Of This Provision, He Must Be Appointed By The Governor In The Manner Required By Section 7, Article Vi
Title
Adjutant General
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-27 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House: Adopt Resolution (Y: 108 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House: Table Motion To Recommit (Y: 95 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House: Adopt Resolution (Y: 108 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House: Table Motion To Recommit (Y: 95 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-08 | Act No. 297 | |
2014-05-29 | Effective date 05/29/2014 | |
2014-05-29 | No signature required | |
2014-05-29 | Ratified R 250 | |
2014-05-27 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2014-05-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2013-04-11 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2013-03-21 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2013-03-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-4 |
2013-03-20 | House | Read second time |
2013-03-19 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2013-03-18 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-03-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Knight |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-02-19 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0052 (Similar To) 2013-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0054 (Similar To) 2013-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0132 (Similar To) 2013-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0173 (Similar To) 2013-03-21 - Scrivener's error corrected
S0170 (Similar To) 2013-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0444 (Similar To) 2013-02-27 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0467 (Similar To) 2013-02-28 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0054 (Similar To) 2013-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0132 (Similar To) 2013-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0173 (Similar To) 2013-03-21 - Scrivener's error corrected
S0170 (Similar To) 2013-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0444 (Similar To) 2013-02-27 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0467 (Similar To) 2013-02-28 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary