SC H3424 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 57-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 39-5-190 So As To Provide Definitions, To Provide That It Is Unlawful For An Operator To Make A Pornographic Website Available To Persons Under The Age Of Eighteen, To Provide That The Attorney General Shall Create Certain Procedures, And To Provide For A Private Right Of Action.
Title
Child Online Safety Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-05-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Amended |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-02-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-113 Nays-1 |
2024-02-01 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-01-31 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-1 |
2024-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2024-01-31 | House | Amended |
2024-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis, Hixon, Taylor, J.E.Johnson, Chapman, Ott |
2024-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: M.M.Smith, Davis, B.Newton, Elliott, Forrest |
2024-01-25 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2024-01-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bradley, Murphy, Brewer, Connell, Hiott, Mitchell, Erickson, Hager, Erickson, B.J.Cox, Blackwell, Wooten, Ballentine, Hyde, Wheeler, Calhoon |
2024-01-24 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2024-01-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brittain, Bailey, Robbins, Sessions, Ligon, Felder, B.L.Cox, Guffey |
2024-01-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Moss, Magnuson, Harris, Pace |
2024-01-18 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Guest, Schuessler |
2024-01-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Long, Vaughan, Haddon, Burns, Chumley, Kilmartin, Cromer, O'Neal, Yow, Gilliam, W.Newton |
2023-01-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Oremus |
2023-01-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Nutt |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-12-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-12-08 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3426 (Similar To) 2023-01-19 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Oremus