SC H3232 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-17 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-17 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide Proof Of Insurance May Be Contained In A Physical Document Issued By An Automobile Insurer Or In An Electronic Format To A Mobile Electronic Device Provided By An Automobile Insurer, And To Provide That If A Person Fails To Provide Proof Of Insurance Upon Demand By A Law Enforcement Officer, Then His Vehicle Must Be Impounded, Its Owner Must Be Fined, The Vehicle May Not Be Retrieved Until Proof Of Insurance Is Provided, And The Vehicle Must Be Disposed Of If It Has Been Abandoned.
Title
Maintenance of proof of insurance in vehicle
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-22 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2014-12-18 | House | Prefiled |