SC H3163 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-21 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-21 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminate The Corporate Income Tax Over A Four-year Period.
Title
Corporate income tax
Sponsors
Rep. Tommy Stringer [R] | Rep. Garry Smith [R] | Rep. Phyllis Henderson [R] | Rep. Donna Wood [R] |
Rep. Thomas Pope [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope |
2015-02-18 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hicks |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2014-12-11 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3085 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rivers
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3163&session=121&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/3163_20141211.htm |