RI S3141 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study And Review The Rhode Island Condominium Act And The Uniform Common Ownership Interest Act (this Resolution Would Create A Seven Member Commission To Study The Rhode Island Condominium Act And Uniform Common Ownership Interest Act, And Who Would Report To The General Assembly By February 3, 2015, And Would Expire On May 3, 2015.)
Title
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study And Review The Rhode Island Condominium Act And The Uniform Common Ownership Interest Act (this Resolution Would Create A Seven Member Commission To Study The Rhode Island Condominium Act And Uniform Common Ownership Interest Act, And Who Would Report To The General Assembly By February 3, 2015, And Would Expire On May 3, 2015.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-21 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |