RI S2936 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- ACCIDENTS AND ACCIDENT REPORTS - Provides for a single, increased range of penalties for all driving offenses which result in serious bodily injury or death.
Title
Provides for a single, increased range of penalties for all driving offenses which result in serious bodily injury or death.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. David Tikoian [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Mark McKenney [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2024) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2936.pdf |