RI S2879 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- LEVY AND ASSESSMENT OF LOCAL TAXES - Provides that only residential properties and new or rehabilitated residential affordable housing units would be subject to the tax under § 44-5-13.1 relating to taxation of low-income housing.
Title
Provides that only residential properties and new or rehabilitated residential affordable housing units would be subject to the tax under § 44-5-13.1 relating to taxation of low-income housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Samuel Zurier [D] | Sen. Jacob Bissaillon [D] |
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2879.pdf |