RI S2832 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- MISCELLANEOUS RULES - Provides additional exception to prohibition on usage of wireless communication device while driving and clarifies that use for purpose of navigation must be while the device is mounted or otherwise affixed to vehicle and not held in the motorist’s hand.
Title
Provides additional exception to prohibition on usage of wireless communication device while driving and clarifies that use for purpose of navigation must be while the device is mounted or otherwise affixed to vehicle and not held in the motorist’s hand.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Jacob Bissaillon [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2832.pdf |