RI S2810 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Scheduled for consideration (05/01/2024)
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Hearing: May 1 Senate Environment and Agriculture Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Scheduled for consideration (05/01/2024)
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Hearing: May 1 Senate Environment and Agriculture Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FISH AND WILDLIFE -- DEER HUNTING - Modifies reporting requirements regarding collisions between vehicles and wildlife where the vehicle has been substantially damaged.
Title
Modifies reporting requirements regarding collisions between vehicles and wildlife where the vehicle has been substantially damaged.
Sponsors
Sen. David Tikoian [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] | Sen. Matthew LaMountain [D] |
Sen. Robert Britto [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/01/2024) |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2810.pdf |