RI S2806 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-04 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-04 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending The Charter Of North Providence
Title
Amending The Charter Of North Providence
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Edward O'Neil [I] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-04 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2014-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-05-29 | Senate | House voted to recommit to House Municipal Government |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (05/29/2014) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/22/2014) |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/08/2014) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/01/2014) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2014) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |