RI S2778 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ELECTIONS -- MAIL BALLOTS - Establishes a three (3) day transmittal period after the deadline for local boards to accept mail ballot applications, if delivered via the postal service.
Title
Establishes a three (3) day transmittal period after the deadline for local boards to accept mail ballot applications, if delivered via the postal service.
Sponsors
Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Tiara Mack [D] |
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2024) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2778.pdf |